U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05067
  • Case Name: Cochrun v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 08, 2015: [Objection]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 15, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.