U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05066
  • Case Name: Charles, III v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Response]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Reverse]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • August 03, 2016: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
  • August 03, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • July 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [Leave to]
  • December 02, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2015: [Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • September 10, 2015: [Complaint - Social Security Appeal (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.