U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04139
  • Case Name: Kiir v. Vanderhule et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 15, 2015: [Extend]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 08, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 08, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 08, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.