U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03015
  • Case Name: Lightning Fire et al v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 02, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 17, 2017: [Response]
  • February 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 09, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 16, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
  • January 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • November 09, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • September 03, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 03, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.