U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04137
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Calvin L. Salem and Alice B. Salem Family Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 28, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • September 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 28, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.