U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05046
  • Case Name: Eagle Aviation, Inc. v. Continental Western Group
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 25, 2016: [Extend]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 22, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.