U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05065
  • Case Name: Rapid Fire Protection, Inc. v. Benson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 10, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Enforce]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Status Report]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 26, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 13, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 15, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 13, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 08, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 07, 2015: [Reply]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Stay]
  • September 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2015: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2015: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.