U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04136
  • Case Name: Sioux Steel Company v. KC Engineering
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment - Consent]
  • January 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2019: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • April 20, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • April 20, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 06, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2018: [Response]
  • April 06, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • April 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 16, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • March 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 16, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Return of Service]
  • October 04, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 18, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 27, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 27, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.