U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05063
  • Case Name: Kurtenbach v. Dooley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Mail Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 05, 2015: [Extend]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 24, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.