U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05062
  • Case Name: Temple v. Her Many Horses
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter Sent]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • September 04, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 24, 2019: [Response]
  • May 24, 2019: [Statement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Quash]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2019: [Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Substitute Party]
  • February 13, 2019: [Extend]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stay]
  • January 07, 2019: [Response]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Leave to]
  • December 18, 2018: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • November 30, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 18, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 18, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Response]
  • June 08, 2018: [Proposed Schedule]
  • June 07, 2018: [Proposed Schedule]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2018: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 03, 2018: [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2017: [Affidavit in Support]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2017: [Objection]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2017: [Leave to]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Leave to]
  • January 10, 2017: [Witness List]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Reply]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 24, 2016: [Leave to]
  • October 24, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 24, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • October 24, 2016: [Substitute Party]
  • October 24, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • September 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response]
  • September 19, 2016: [Text Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 07, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 13, 2016: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 31, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Letter Sent]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 28, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 28, 2016: [Response]
  • March 24, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 17, 2016: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2016: [Expedite]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 19, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • February 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 05, 2016: [Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 22, 2016: [Response]
  • January 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 04, 2015: [Reply]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 24, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 13, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 09, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 23, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 19, 2015: [Response]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 09, 2015: [Leave to]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Brief]
  • September 01, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Exhibit List]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 26, 2015: [Response]
  • August 26, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 25, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 21, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 20, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2015: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.