U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03014
  • Case Name: Wilcox et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Settlement Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 17, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 17, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 17, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.