U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05059
  • Case Name: Meyer v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 14, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 14, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 14, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.