U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04120
  • Case Name: Thunder v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Letter Sent]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • July 26, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 26, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 25, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 25, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 25, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • July 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Hearing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • May 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 02, 2016: [Letter Received]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 04, 2016: [Letter Received]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Letter Received]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 16, 2015: [Letter Received]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2015: [Received]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2015: [Brief]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 28, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 28, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.