U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04134
  • Case Name: DuBois v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 05, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 31, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 19, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 12, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • September 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Certificate]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 18, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 11, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2016: [Reply]
  • April 06, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 15, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 03, 2016: [Extend]
  • March 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Response]
  • February 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 18, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 17, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Response]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • October 20, 2015: [Remark]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 14, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 13, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
  • September 24, 2015: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 24, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order]
  • September 09, 2015: [Letter Sent]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 12, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • August 11, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2015: [Letter Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.