U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04133
  • Case Name: Embry v. Autumn Winds, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 03, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
  • December 01, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • October 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 01, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.