U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cv-04091
  • Case Name: Yankton Sioux Tribe et al v. Kempthorne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • March 04, 2016: [Response]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Leave to]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 12, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 30, 2015: [Leave to]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 23, 2015: [Leave to]
  • October 09, 2015: [Joinder]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2015: [Statement]
  • September 29, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2015: [Leave to]
  • August 05, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.