U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04132
  • Case Name: Clark v. State of South Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 11, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 19, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • August 05, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 05, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.