U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04131
  • Case Name: American Dairy Queen Corporation v. Wardlow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 07, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • November 24, 2015: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Declaration]
  • November 20, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 13, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 03, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 24, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 21, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 21, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice]
  • August 13, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 06, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 06, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 04, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 04, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 04, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.