U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04130
  • Case Name: Wishard v. Alliance Insurance Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • August 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • August 04, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 04, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.