U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04129
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Mondelez International, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 07, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • March 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 03, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 27, 2016: [Entry of Default]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Return of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 03, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 03, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.