U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03013
  • Case Name: Ross v. Carpenter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [USCA Order]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 01, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 27, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • February 11, 2016: [Certificate]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 31, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 31, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 12, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Stay]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 13, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • September 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order]
  • August 28, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • August 03, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • August 03, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.