U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:02-cv-05071
  • Case Name: USA v. White Plume, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 05, 2016: [Leave to]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Response]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 11, 2015: [Extend]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Vacate]
  • July 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.