U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01028
  • Case Name: State Auto Insurance Company v. Gates Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Dismiss]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 26, 2015: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 23, 2015: [Withdraw]
  • October 23, 2015: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 16, 2015: [Order]
  • September 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Return of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 29, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.