U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05056
  • Case Name: Cline v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 29, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 29, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.