U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05055
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 4.70 Acres of Land, More or Less In the County of Penning
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Appear]
  • October 23, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2015: [Expedite]
  • August 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 30, 2015: [Receipt]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • July 29, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 29, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 29, 2015: [Declaration]
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 29, 2015: [Deposit Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.