U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04128
  • Case Name: Meidinger v. Codington Clark Electric Cooperative, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • August 25, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 07, 2015: [Return of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.