U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05054
  • Case Name: Kugler Oil Company v. Archer Daniels Midland Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • October 08, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 13, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 24, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 24, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 24, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.