U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04095
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Brennan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 01, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Verdict]
  • November 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 31, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Jury List]
  • October 30, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 30, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • October 27, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 27, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • October 27, 2017: [Response]
  • October 27, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [In Limine]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Response]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Leave to]
  • February 23, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Leave to]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 01, 2016: [Leave to]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 25, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 11, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 23, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2015: [Letter Sent]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 21, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.