U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05053
  • Case Name: Dakota Hotel Ventures, LLC v. David Baumann-Architect, Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 06, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2015: [Change Venue]
  • August 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 17, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 17, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 17, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 17, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.