U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05052
  • Case Name: Koch v. Meade County Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 09, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 09, 2015: [Request]
  • November 09, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • November 09, 2015: [Mail Returned]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 04, 2015: [Supplement]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 27, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 27, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • July 16, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 16, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.