U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04127
  • Case Name: Readd v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Remark]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Protective Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 02, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reverse]
  • May 02, 2016: [Recusal]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Strike]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Response]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Protective Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • November 16, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 26, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 09, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 16, 2015: [Statement]
  • July 16, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Brief]
  • July 16, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.