U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04123
  • Case Name: Frankhouser v. Wells Fargo & Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 11, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2015: [Response]
  • August 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 11, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 21, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 21, 2015: [Declaration]
  • July 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 16, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 16, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.