U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04119
  • Case Name: Loyd v. Armor Medical et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Mail Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 29, 2015: [Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 06, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Supplement]
  • July 20, 2015: [Supplement]
  • July 16, 2015: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.