U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04124
  • Case Name: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Korzan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 04, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 27, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 27, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • October 16, 2015: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 16, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.