U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04126
  • Case Name: Johnston v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 20, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 13, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 16, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 16, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.