U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05042
  • Case Name: Baker v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 27, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 24, 2015: [Reverse]
  • December 01, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
  • September 29, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • August 20, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 13, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.