U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04121
  • Case Name: Shaw v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 20, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 05, 2018: [Letter Sent]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 26, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 26, 2018: [Verdict]
  • April 26, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 26, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • April 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 25, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury List]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 23, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2018: [Application]
  • April 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • April 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2018: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 05, 2018: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • February 05, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 23, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2018: [Certificate]
  • January 12, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 13, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 23, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 05, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Compel]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2017: [Stay]
  • March 30, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • February 02, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • February 02, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 01, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Certificate]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 31, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 31, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2016: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • September 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order]
  • August 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • April 20, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 12, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • August 12, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 12, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 13, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • July 13, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.