U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05051
  • Case Name: Wallenstein v. Great American Insurance Group
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 12, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 10, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • July 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 10, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.