U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00128
  • Case Name: State of Rhode Island, et al. v. Trump et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit in Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.