U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Consorti
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing Defendant Request]
  • April 03, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Forfeiture Allegation]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.