U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10459
  • Case Name: Pheune Alounevong
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Ch. 7 Trustee & Closing No Asset Case]
  • August 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Retired -Discharging Debtor (Autodisch)]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Document]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Document]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.