U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10454
  • Case Name: Jean A. Estephan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Avoid Lien (for Chs. 7, 11 and 12 only)]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Avoid Lien]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Avoid Lien (for Chs. 7, 11 and 12 only)]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Reopen Chapter 7/13 Case]
  • September 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Ch. 7 Trustee & Closing No Asset Case]
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course (Post Filing Certificate)]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Notice of Intent to Close Case]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Initial Financial Management Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Amended Schedules and Statements]
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Document]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting Continued]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Trustee Document]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B21)]
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Pay Filing Fee]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Set Financial Management Ddl]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - case upload]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.