U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00285
  • Case Name: San Miguel, LLC v. STJ, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Case Referred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • October 15, 2020: [Rule 16 Statement]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • August 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2020: [Counterclaim]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 29, 2020: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • June 29, 2020: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.