U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Roberts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Default Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 07, 2021: [Rule 16 Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Rule 16 Statement]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default (Form Attached)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Application for Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2020: [Summons Request]
  • December 21, 2020: [Alternative Service]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • November 24, 2020: [Alternative Service]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 16, 2020: [Service]
  • October 15, 2020: [Motions Referred]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • September 24, 2020: [Service]
  • September 24, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2020: [Summons Request]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 18, 2020: [Summons Request]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 26, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 26, 2020: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • June 26, 2020: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.