U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Sabo, et al v. Stop and Shop
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2022: [ADR Mediation]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • August 13, 2020: [Rule 16 Statement]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2020: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 22, 2020: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2020: [Summons Request]
  • June 22, 2020: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.