U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Ogarek et al v. Quest Diagnostics LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response]
  • January 05, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to Response]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • December 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 28, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2021: [Suggestion of Death]
  • October 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Compel]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Entering Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 04, 2021: [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2021: [Quash]
  • February 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 09, 2020: [Quash]
  • December 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order (form attached)]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Rule 16 Statement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Rule 16 Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2020: [Rule 16 Statement]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2020: [Summons Request]
  • June 19, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 19, 2020: [Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.