U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrella
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Declaration]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue/Reset]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue / Reset]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue/Reset]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Signed Waiver of Arraignment or Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arraignment or Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • July 19, 2022: [Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet (Backer)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.