U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zafar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Restitution List]
  • October 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Petition]
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 18, 2022: [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
  • July 18, 2022: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 12, 2022: [Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet (Backer)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.