U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Heath
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • September 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Docket]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.