U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Alaniz-Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Violation Report - Post Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2022: [DPPA-Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Preliminary Examination]
  • August 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2022: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • February 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Violation Report - Post Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [DPPA-Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Preliminary Examination]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2022: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2022: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision (12B)]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice from Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 11, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.